ID S1153 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Session Law Chapter 290 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

LOBBYING -- Amends existing law to revise requirements for lobbyist registration and reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise requirements for lobbyist registration and reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateSession Law Chapter 290 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-02SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-01HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-29SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-28SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-27Houseto Senate
2019-03-27HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-27HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2019-03-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-25HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-13HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2019-03-13HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-12Senateto House
2019-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-12SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2019-03-11SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-08SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-04SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback