ID S1152 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 246 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

UNCLAIMED PROPERTY -- Amends existing law to provide for broadband service and to provide a certain exemption for a nonprofit corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for broadband service and to provide a certain exemption for a nonprofit corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateSession Law Chapter 246 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-28SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-27HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-25SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-22Houseto Senate
2019-03-22HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2019-03-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-12HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2019-03-12HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-11Senateto House
2019-03-11SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-11SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-03-08SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-04SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback