ID S1150 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Session Law Chapter 281 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Session Law Chapter 281 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- Amends and repeals existing law to revise provisions regarding the individual high risk reinsurance pool.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law to revise provisions regarding the individual high risk reinsurance pool.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 281 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-6-0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-17 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2017-03-17 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |