ID S1144 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to animals to provide that the Division of Animal Industries shall be responsible for administering specified law as it pertains to production animals, to provide that local law enforcement agencies shall be responsible for administering specified law as it pertains to companion animals and to authorize local law enforcement to call on the division for aid; and to revise the definition of "production animal."
Title
Amends existing law relating to animals to provide that the Division of Animal Industries shall be responsible for administering specified law as it pertains to production animals, to provide that local law enforcement agencies shall be responsible for administering specified law as it pertains to companion animals and to authorize local law enforcement to call on the division for aid; and to revise the definition of "production animal."
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/08 | |
2011-04-07 | To Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-06 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-06 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-06 | To enrol | |
2011-04-05 | to Senate | |
2011-04-05 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-3-2 | |
2011-03-30 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-30 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-29 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-23 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-23 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-23 | House intro | |
2011-03-22 | to House | |
2011-03-22 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-0-3 | |
2011-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-18 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-08 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-08 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-07 | to printing | |
2011-03-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-07 | Senate intro |