ID S1143 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding standards for Medicare supplement policies and certificates.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding standards for Medicare supplement policies and certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-04-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-04-14 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-14 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2021-04-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2021-03-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |