ID S1134 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE DISASTER EMERGENCY ACCOUNT -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the Disaster Emergency Account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the Disaster Emergency Account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2021-04-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2021-04-08SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2021-04-08Houseto Senate
2021-04-08HouseTitle apvd
2021-04-08HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2021-04-08HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-04-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-04-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-03-05HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-03-05HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-03-04Senateto House
2021-03-04SenateTitle apvd
2021-03-04SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2021-03-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-02-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-24SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback