ID S1133 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 306 Effective: 04/11/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 306 Effective: 04/11/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to horse racing; to revise provisions relating to the number of races per day and the number of days of racing.
Title
Amends existing law relating to horse racing; to revise provisions relating to the number of races per day and the number of days of racing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 306 Effective: 04/11/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/08 | |
2011-04-07 | To Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-06 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-06 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-06 | To enrol | |
2011-04-05 | to Senate | |
2011-04-05 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-05 | Bilbao & Higgins | |
2011-04-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 56-13-1 AYES -- Anderson, Barbieri, Barrett, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Buckner-Webb(McCoy), Burgoyne, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Loertscher, Luker, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Sims, Smith(30), Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35) NAYS -- Andrus, Bateman, Boyle, Harwood, Lake, Marriott, McGeachin, Nonini, Raybould, Shirley, Simpson, Smith(24), Mr. Speaker Absent and excused -- Chadderdon(Chadderdon) Floor Sponsors | |
2011-03-30 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-30 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-29 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-25 | to St Aff | |
2011-03-25 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-25 | House intro | |
2011-03-24 | to House | |
2011-03-24 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-24 | Winder | |
2011-03-24 | 27-6-2 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, McWilliam(Malepeai), McKague, McKenzie, Nuxoll, Schmidt, Siddoway, Smyser, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Davis, Hill, Mortimer, Pearce, Stennett, Tippets Absent and excused -- McGee, Stegner Floor Sponsor | |
2011-03-24 | PASSED | |
2011-03-24 | Rls susp | |
2011-03-24 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2011-03-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2011-03-23 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-23 | Rpt engros | |
2011-03-22 | to engros | |
2011-03-22 | Rpt out amen | |
2011-03-15 | to 14th Ord | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-25 | to St Aff | |
2011-02-25 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-24 | to printing | |
2011-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-24 | Senate intro |