ID S1130 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES -- Adds to and amends existing law to prohibit the release of emissions under certain conditions and to prohibit certain modification of diesel-powered vehicles.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to prohibit the release of emissions under certain conditions and to prohibit certain modification of diesel-powered vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- FAILED 16-18-1 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |