ID S1129 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 221 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

DENTISTS -- Amends existing law to provide for dental therapists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for dental therapists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSession Law Chapter 221 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-20SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-19Houseto Senate
2019-03-19HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-19HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-9-2
2019-03-18HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-06HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-03-06HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-05Senateto House
2019-03-05SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-05SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 30-4-1
2019-03-01SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-02-28SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-02-28SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-02-28SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-02-28SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-02-28SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-27SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-26SenateRetained on calendar
2019-02-26SenateRead third time in full
2019-02-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-20SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback