ID S1127 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Session Law Chapter 219 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE SYMBOLS -- Adds to existing law to designate Oryctodromeus as the state dinosaur.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to designate Oryctodromeus as the state dinosaur.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30SenateSession Law Chapter 219 Effective: 07/01/2023
2023-03-28SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2023-03-28HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2023-03-27SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2023-03-24SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2023-03-24Houseto Senate
2023-03-24HouseTitle apvd
2023-03-24HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-2-7
2023-03-23HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2023-03-23HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2023-03-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2023-03-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2023-03-15HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2023-03-15HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2023-03-14Senateto House
2023-03-14SenateTitle apvd
2023-03-14SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2023-03-13SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2023-03-10SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2023-02-28SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2023-02-27SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback