ID S1126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION FUNDING -- Amends existing law to extend the Strategic Initiatives Program and the Budget Stabilization Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to extend the Strategic Initiatives Program and the Budget Stabilization Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-04-05SenateRead second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading
2019-04-04SenateRead first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
2019-04-04SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-04-04SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
2019-04-03SenateReported out with recommendation to concur in House amendment; to 10th order
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Transportation for concurrence recommendation
2019-04-03SenateReturned from House, amended
2019-04-02Houseto Senate
2019-04-02HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-02HouseRules Suspended:
2019-04-02HouseRead second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading
2019-04-01HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2019-04-01HouseFiled for First Reading
2019-04-01HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-04-01HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-04-01HouseRetained on General Orders
2019-03-27HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-03-19HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-03-19HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-18Senateto House
2019-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-18SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-18SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2019-02-15SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback