ID S1125 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 163 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WAREHOUSES -- Amends existing law to provide for electronic negotiable warehouse receipts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for electronic negotiable warehouse receipts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSession Law Chapter 163 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-19HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-18SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-14Houseto Senate
2019-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 60-0-10
2019-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-08HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-07HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2019-02-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-26Senateto House
2019-02-26SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-18SenateReported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs
2019-02-15SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback