ID S1124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

DOMESTIC RELATIONS -- Repeals and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding visitation rights for grandparents and great-grandparents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding visitation rights for grandparents and great-grandparents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-03-22SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-03-21SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-03-21SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-03-21SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-21SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-03-21SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-03-21SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-19SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-15SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback