ID S1124 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
DOMESTIC RELATIONS -- Repeals and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding visitation rights for grandparents and great-grandparents.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding visitation rights for grandparents and great-grandparents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |