ID S1122 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMISSIONERS ON UNIFORM STATE LAWS -- Amends existing law to provide that certain persons shall be members; to clarify that a commissioner appointed by the Governor shall have a certain term of office and to clarify per diem payments to life member commissioners.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain persons shall be members; to clarify that a commissioner appointed by the Governor shall have a certain term of office and to clarify per diem payments to life member commissioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2017-03-09 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |