ID S1121 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 253 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 253 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IMMUNIZATION REGISTRY - Amends existing law relating to information in the immunization registry.
Title
Amends existing law relating to information in the immunization registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 253 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/30/15 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-03-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-24 | House | PASSED -- 37-33-0 |
2015-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2015-03-11 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-10 | Senate | PASSED -- 25-10-0 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |