ID S1121 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 106 Effective: 01/01/10 for all decedents on and after that date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 106 Effective: 01/01/10 for all decedents on and after that date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to intestate succession and wills to revise the time frame for filing a disclaimer under certain circumstances; and to remove outdated provisions.
Title
Amends existing law relating to intestate succession and wills to revise the time frame for filing a disclaimer under certain circumstances; and to remove outdated provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 106 Effective: 01/01/10 for all decedents on and after that date | |
2011-03-22 | Delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2011-03-21 | To Governor | |
2011-03-18 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-17 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-17 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-16 | To enrol | |
2011-03-15 | to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2011-03-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-10 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-10 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-03 | to Jud | |
2011-03-03 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-03 | House intro | |
2011-03-02 | to House | |
2011-03-02 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-02 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-02-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-24 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-24 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-18 | to Jud | |
2011-02-18 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-17 | to printing | |
2011-02-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-17 | Senate intro |