ID S1117 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 157 Effective: 03/27/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF LANDS -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Lands for fiscal year 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Lands for fiscal year 2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27SenateSession Law Chapter 157 Effective: 03/27/2023
2023-03-23SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2023-03-23HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2023-03-22SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2023-03-22SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2023-03-21Houseto Senate
2023-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2023-03-21HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-12-4
2023-03-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2023-03-17HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 20, 2023
2023-03-16HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2023-03-16HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2023-03-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2023-03-15HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2023-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2023-03-09HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2023-03-08HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2023-03-07HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2023-03-03Senateto House
2023-03-03SenateTitle apvd
2023-03-03SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 23-10-2
2023-03-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2023-02-28SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2023-02-27SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2023-02-24SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback