ID S1112 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

LEGISLATURE -- Adds to existing law to provide certain requirements for a special session convened by the Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide certain requirements for a special session convened by the Legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-03-18HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-03-17Senateto House
2021-03-17SenateTitle apvd
2021-03-17SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 23-10-2
2021-03-16SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2021-03-15SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2021-03-15SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2021-03-15SenateAmendments reported printed
2021-03-15SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2021-03-15SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2021-03-15SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2021-03-04SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2021-03-01SenateRetained on calendar
2021-02-25SenateRetained on calendar
2021-02-22SenateRetained on calendar
2021-02-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-02-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-16SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback