ID S1111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding city election procedures and to provide that city elections shall be held in even years beginning in 2024.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding city election procedures and to provide that city elections shall be held in even years beginning in 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2021-04-14 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-14 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 53-16-1 |
2021-04-14 | House | Read third time in full as amended in House |
2021-04-13 | House | Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-12 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-09 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-07 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders, no objection |
2021-04-07 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2021-04-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-02 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |