ID S1109 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

MOTORCYCLES -- Adds to existing law to provide that law enforcement shall not engage in motorcycle profiling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that law enforcement shall not engage in motorcycle profiling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateFiled in Office of the Secretary of Senate
2019-03-04SenateRead third time in full as amended -- FAILED 17-18-0
2019-03-01SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-02-28SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-02-28SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-02-28SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-02-28SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-02-28SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-21SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-14SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback