ID S1109 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 217 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 217 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BOARD OF CORRECTION -- Amends existing law to provide that certain initial reviews may be held in executive session, to provide that certain deliberations and voting shall be made in executive session and to provide for firearm restoration in certain instances.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain initial reviews may be held in executive session, to provide that certain deliberations and voting shall be made in executive session and to provide for firearm restoration in certain instances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 217 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-24 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-22 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2017-03-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-1-1 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |