ID S1108 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
TAXING DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding a taxing district's budget limitations.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding a taxing district's budget limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- FAILED 17-18-0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |