ID S1106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 298 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to provide for the expansion of virtual, blended, traditional, or other secondary career technical education programs, as approved by the Board of Career Technical Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for the expansion of virtual, blended, traditional, or other secondary career technical education programs, as approved by the Board of Career Technical Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateSession Law Chapter 298 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-02SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-02HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-01SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-29SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-28Houseto Senate
2019-03-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-10-2
2019-03-28HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders; objection
2019-03-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2019-03-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-21Senateto House
2019-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-21SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-03-20SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-03-19SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-03-19SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-03-19SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-19SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-03-19SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-03-19SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-08SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback