ID S1104 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Signed by Governor on 04/06/15 Session Law Chapter 280 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Signed by Governor on 04/06/15 Session Law Chapter 280 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
VETERANS - Adds to existing law to authorize the establishment of a veterans home.
Title
Adds to existing law to authorize the establishment of a veterans home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/06/15 Session Law Chapter 280 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/02/15 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-04-01 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-03-30 | Senate | to enrol |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Nonini |
2015-03-30 | Senate | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- McKenzie Floor Sponsor |
2015-03-30 | Senate | PASSED |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2015-03-27 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-27 | House | Mendive |
2015-03-27 | House | 69-0-1 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew(Killen), Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Malek Floor Sponsor |
2015-03-27 | House | PASSED |
2015-03-27 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2015-03-26 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2015-03-06 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-06 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-05 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |