ID S1103 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
Pending: House Transportation and Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
Pending: House Transportation and Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TRANSPORTATION -- Adds to existing law to establish an Idaho Air Travel Enhancement Program.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish an Idaho Air Travel Enhancement Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 18-16-1 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |