ID S1103 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SCHOOLS -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the boundaries of school trustee zones, to provide that a school district may allow districtwide voting for all trustees, and to revise the dates of a school trustee's term of office.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the boundaries of school trustee zones, to provide that a school district may allow districtwide voting for all trustees, and to revise the dates of a school trustee's term of office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |