ID S1102 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Signed by Governor on 03/13/13 Session Law Chapter 75 Effective: 03/13/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reduces the appropriation to the Regulatory Boards by $1,125,000 for fiscal year 2013, and revises the standard class appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduces the appropriation to the Regulatory Boards by $1,125,000 for fiscal year 2013, and revises the standard class appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13SenateSigned by Governor on 03/13/13 Session Law Chapter 75 Effective: 03/13/13
2013-03-12SenateReported delivered to Governor on 03/12/13
2013-03-12SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2013-03-11HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2013-03-08SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2013-03-07SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2013-03-06Houseto Senate
2013-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2013-03-06HousePASSED -- 66-0-4
2013-03-06HouseRead Third Time in Full
2013-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 4, 2013
2013-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-02-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-02-25HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2013-02-25HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2013-02-22Senateto House
2013-02-22SenateTitle apvd
2013-02-22SenatePASSED -- 34-0-1
2013-02-22SenateRead third time in full
2013-02-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-02-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-02-14SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2013-02-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback