ID S1099 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 214 Effective: 04/04/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 214 Effective: 04/04/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
DEPARTMENT OF LANDS -- Amends existing law to provide for an administrator to handle matters of oil and gas conservation and to provide qualifications.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for an administrator to handle matters of oil and gas conservation and to provide qualifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 214 Effective: 04/04/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-24 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-22 | Senate | to enrol |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the House -- PASSED 29-3-3 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2017-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-17 | House | Read third time in full as amended in House -- PASSED 55-12-3 |
2017-03-16 | House | Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-09 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2017-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-27 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2017-02-27 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-24 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-3-0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |