ID S1099 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor on 03/20/15 Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor on 03/20/15 Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IRRIGATION - Amends and adds to existing law to revise conditions under which parties constitute a lateral water users' association; to provide that the operation, improvement, repair and maintenance of certain laterals and ditches shall be under the direction of the directors of the lateral water users' association, to revise provisions relating to the examination of laterals and ditches and preparation of estimates of total costs, to revise provisions relating to assessment of water users; to provide that assessments shall be a lien upon certain lands of a water user, to provide for the recording, collection and duration of liens, to provide for priority of certain liens; and to provide a procedure for withdrawal from a lateral water users' association.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to revise conditions under which parties constitute a lateral water users' association; to provide that the operation, improvement, repair and maintenance of certain laterals and ditches shall be under the direction of the directors of the lateral water users' association, to revise provisions relating to the examination of laterals and ditches and preparation of estimates of total costs, to revise provisions relating to assessment of water users; to provide that assessments shall be a lien upon certain lands of a water user, to provide for the recording, collection and duration of liens, to provide for priority of certain liens; and to provide a procedure for withdrawal from a lateral water users' association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/20/15 Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/17/15 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-03-16 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-11 | House | PASSED -- 64-4-2 |
2015-03-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2015-02-27 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-02-26 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-1-0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |