ID S1098 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BONE MARROW DONATION -- Adds to existing law to provide that physicians may inquire if patients are bone marrow donors and offer them information on the bone marrow registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that physicians may inquire if patients are bone marrow donors and offer them information on the bone marrow registry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-02-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-21Senateto House
2019-02-21SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-21SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-18SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback