ID S1096 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 127 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 127 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Electronic Recording Commission to provide for location of the commission in the office of the Secretary of State and to provide a certain duty of the commission members.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Electronic Recording Commission to provide for location of the commission in the office of the Secretary of State and to provide a certain duty of the commission members.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 127 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-21 | Delivered to Governor on 03/18 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor | |
2011-03-17 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-16 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-16 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-15 | To enrol | |
2011-03-14 | to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-14 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-1-2 | |
2011-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-02 | to Jud | |
2011-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-02 | House intro | |
2011-03-01 | to House | |
2011-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-02-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-22 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-22 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-15 | to Jud | |
2011-02-15 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-14 | to printing | |
2011-02-14 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-14 | Senate intro |