ID S1092 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MEDICAID -- Amends existing law to provide for reimbursement for new in-state hospitals serving as Medicaid providers.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for reimbursement for new in-state hospitals serving as Medicaid providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2021-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |