ID S1092 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Signed by Governor on 03/21/13 Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Signed by Governor on 03/21/13 Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law relating to education to establish provisions relating to additional math and science courses; to establish provisions relating to meeting graduation requirements for math and science courses, to provide for the distribution of certain moneys, to provide for the use of such moneys, to establish criteria for the distribution of moneys and to establish provisions relating to certain ninth grade students for the purposes of school size classifications.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law relating to education to establish provisions relating to additional math and science courses; to establish provisions relating to meeting graduation requirements for math and science courses, to provide for the distribution of certain moneys, to provide for the use of such moneys, to establish criteria for the distribution of moneys and to establish provisions relating to certain ninth grade students for the purposes of school size classifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/21/13 Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/15/13 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-12 | House | PASSED -- 67-0-3 |
2013-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2013 |
2013-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2013-02-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-02-25 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |