ID S1091 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 250 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 250 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPORTIONMENT PLANS - Adds to existing law to provide a process for challenge of an apportionment plan adopted by the Commission on Reapportionment; and to provide for rules of the Idaho Supreme Court governing such challenge.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide a process for challenge of an apportionment plan adopted by the Commission on Reapportionment; and to provide for rules of the Idaho Supreme Court governing such challenge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 250 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/30/15 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-03-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-24 | House | PASSED -- 66-2-2 |
2015-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-02 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |