ID S1089 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Session Law Chapter 172 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Session Law Chapter 172 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
RAPE -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding rape where the victim is under the age of 16 or is 16 or 17 years of age and repeals existing law relating to rape of a spouse.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding rape where the victim is under the age of 16 or is 16 or 17 years of age and repeals existing law relating to rape of a spouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 172 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-04-07 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-07 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2021-03-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |