ID S1089 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 176 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WITNESSES IN CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS -- Amends existing law to provide that facility dogs shall be allowed to remain at the witness stand with a child during testimony in certain instances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that facility dogs shall be allowed to remain at the witness stand with a child during testimony in certain instances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateSession Law Chapter 176 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-21SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2017-03-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2017-03-20SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2017-03-17SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2017-03-16Houseto Senate
2017-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-16HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-1-0
2017-03-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-03-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-24HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2017-02-24HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2017-02-23Senateto House
2017-02-23SenateTitle apvd
2017-02-23SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2017-02-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-02-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-02-14SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2017-02-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback