ID S1089 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Signed by Governor on 03/21/13 Session Law Chapter 97 Effective: 03/21/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals and amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to school districts employing retired teachers and administrators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals and amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to school districts employing retired teachers and administrators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-21SenateSigned by Governor on 03/21/13 Session Law Chapter 97 Effective: 03/21/13
2013-03-18SenateReported delivered to Governor on 03/15/13
2013-03-15SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2013-03-15HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2013-03-15SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2013-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2013-03-14Houseto Senate
2013-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2013-03-14HousePASSED -- 54-15-1
2013-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full
2013-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-08HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2013
2013-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-03-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2013-02-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2013-02-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2013-02-26Senateto House
2013-02-26SenateTitle apvd
2013-02-26SenatePASSED -- 29-6-0
2013-02-26SenateRead third time in full
2013-02-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2013-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback