ID S1087 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEALTH -- Amends existing law to raise the age of legal possession and use of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices to 21.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to raise the age of legal possession and use of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices to 21.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenateReturned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
2021-04-06HouseOrder ret’d to Senate
2021-04-06HousePreviously Read in Full -- FAILED 28-40-2
2021-04-06HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-03-18HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-17HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-16HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-03-10HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-03-03HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2021-03-03HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-03-02Senateto House
2021-03-02SenateTitle apvd
2021-03-02SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 25-10-0
2021-02-26SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-02-25SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-11SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback