ID S1087 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Signed by Governor on 03/26/15 Session Law Chapter 129 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CHARTER SCHOOLS - Amends existing law to provide an additional preference in admission to public charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide an additional preference in admission to public charter schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-26SenateSigned by Governor on 03/26/15 Session Law Chapter 129 Effective: 07/01/2015
2015-03-24SenateReported delivered to Governor on 03/23/15
2015-03-23SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2015-03-20HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2015-03-19SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2015-03-18SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2015-03-17Houseto Senate
2015-03-17HouseTitle apvd
2015-03-17HousePASSED -- 55-13-2
2015-03-17HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-03-16HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2015-03-13HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-03-12HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-03-03HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2015-03-03HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2015-03-02Senateto House
2015-03-02SenateTitle apvd
2015-03-02SenatePASSED -- 27-7-0
2015-03-02SenateRead third time in full
2015-02-26SenateRetained on calendar
2015-02-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2015-02-24SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2015-02-16SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2015-02-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback