ID S1085 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - to 3rd rdg as amen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - to 3rd rdg as amen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to domestic cervidae; to provide for certified domestic cervidae herds; to provide for the submission of obex samples to approved laboratories; to provide for the establishment of certain requirements and assessment of risk; to provide for periodic verification of domestic cervidae farm and ranch inventories or animals held and individual identification by state or federal animal health officials; to provide that chronic wasting disease sampling requirements shall be based on submission of an obex sample; to provide for waiver requests; to provide for reduction in status; to clarify governance and testing provisions for those herds that are not certified; to provide that the fee imposed on domestic cervidae shall include all domestic cervidae present at the farm or ranch as of December 31 and all domestic cervidae imported from outside of the state that die during the same calendar year; to clarify that fees shall be used only by the Idaho State Department of Agriculture for specified purposes; to provide for the creation of a fund; to revise provisions relating to the use of moneys collected; and to provide for annual accounting reports.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to domestic cervidae; to provide for certified domestic cervidae herds; to provide for the submission of obex samples to approved laboratories; to provide for the establishment of certain requirements and assessment of risk; to provide for periodic verification of domestic cervidae farm and ranch inventories or animals held and individual identification by state or federal animal health officials; to provide that chronic wasting disease sampling requirements shall be based on submission of an obex sample; to provide for waiver requests; to provide for reduction in status; to clarify governance and testing provisions for those herds that are not certified; to provide that the fee imposed on domestic cervidae shall include all domestic cervidae present at the farm or ranch as of December 31 and all domestic cervidae imported from outside of the state that die during the same calendar year; to clarify that fees shall be used only by the Idaho State Department of Agriculture for specified purposes; to provide for the creation of a fund; to revise provisions relating to the use of moneys collected; and to provide for annual accounting reports.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2011-04-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-31 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2011-03-31 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-30 | to 1st rdg as amen | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt out amen | |
2011-03-28 | to Gen Ord | |
2011-03-28 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-22 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-22 | House intro | |
2011-03-21 | to House | |
2011-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 25-9-1 | |
2011-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-14 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-02-14 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-11 | to printing | |
2011-02-11 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-11 | Senate intro |