ID S1084 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IRRIGATION -- Repeals existing law relating to Carey Act construction companies, certain statements filed with county recorders, duties of county recorders, the transfer of certain water rights, certain appeals, fees for decisions on applications for transfers of water rights, the sale of water rights, and certain reports of irrigation companies; and amends existing law to remove provisions regarding certain reports to the Department of Water Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals existing law relating to Carey Act construction companies, certain statements filed with county recorders, duties of county recorders, the transfer of certain water rights, certain appeals, fees for decisions on applications for transfers of water rights, the sale of water rights, and certain reports of irrigation companies; and amends existing law to remove provisions regarding certain reports to the Department of Water Resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSession Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-19HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-18SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-14Houseto Senate
2019-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-0-5
2019-03-13HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-12HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-26HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-02-26HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-25Senateto House
2019-02-25SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-25SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback