ID S1084 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IRRIGATION -- Repeals existing law relating to Carey Act construction companies, certain statements filed with county recorders, duties of county recorders, the transfer of certain water rights, certain appeals, fees for decisions on applications for transfers of water rights, the sale of water rights, and certain reports of irrigation companies; and amends existing law to remove provisions regarding certain reports to the Department of Water Resources.
Title
Repeals existing law relating to Carey Act construction companies, certain statements filed with county recorders, duties of county recorders, the transfer of certain water rights, certain appeals, fees for decisions on applications for transfers of water rights, the sale of water rights, and certain reports of irrigation companies; and amends existing law to remove provisions regarding certain reports to the Department of Water Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 190 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-0-5 |
2019-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2019-02-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |