ID S1083 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 158 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IRRIGATION AND DRAINAGE -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding encroachments on certain rights-of-way, maintenance of embankments, the prevention of damage to others associated with ditches, canals, works, or other aqueducts, buried irrigation conduit, and encroachments on certain easements and rights-of-way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding encroachments on certain rights-of-way, maintenance of embankments, the prevention of damage to others associated with ditches, canals, works, or other aqueducts, buried irrigation conduit, and encroachments on certain easements and rights-of-way.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSession Law Chapter 158 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-19HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-18SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-14Houseto Senate
2019-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 57-0-13
2019-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-27Senateto House
2019-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-27SenatePASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-25SenateRetained on calendar
2019-02-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback