ID S1081 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/13 Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends existing law relating to motor vehicle registration to revise a fee, to provide that certain trailer manufacturers may purchase registration from the department, to establish provisions relating to the issuing of annual registration to certain foreign-based purchasers and to establish provisions relating to the application of an annual fee to a nonexpiring registration fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law relating to motor vehicle registration to revise a fee, to provide that certain trailer manufacturers may purchase registration from the department, to establish provisions relating to the issuing of annual registration to certain foreign-based purchasers and to establish provisions relating to the application of an annual fee to a nonexpiring registration fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22SenateSigned by Governor on 03/22/13 Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 07/01/13
2013-03-20SenateReported delivered to Governor on 03/20/13
2013-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2013-03-19HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2013-03-18SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2013-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2013-03-14Houseto Senate
2013-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2013-03-14HousePASSED -- 65-0-5
2013-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full
2013-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-08HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2013
2013-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-03-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2013-02-26HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2013-02-26HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2013-02-25Senateto House
2013-02-25SenateTitle apvd
2013-02-25SenatePASSED -- 34-0-1
2013-02-25SenateRead third time in full
2013-02-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-02-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2013-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback