ID S1080 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Signed by Governor on 03/26/15 Session Law Chapter 128 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

OCCUPATIONAL LICENSES BUREAU - Adds to existing law to provide for the licensure of genetic counselors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for the licensure of genetic counselors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-26SenateSigned by Governor on 03/26/15 Session Law Chapter 128 Effective: 07/01/2015
2015-03-24SenateReported delivered to Governor on 03/23/15
2015-03-23SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2015-03-20HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2015-03-19SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2015-03-18SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2015-03-17Houseto Senate
2015-03-17HouseTitle apvd
2015-03-17HousePASSED -- 45-25-0
2015-03-17HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-03-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-03-13HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-03-10HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2015-03-10HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2015-03-09Senateto House
2015-03-09SenateTitle apvd
2015-03-09SenatePASSED -- 21-14-0 -Engelking
2015-03-09SenateRead third time in full as amended
2015-03-05SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2015-03-04SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2015-03-04SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2015-03-04SenateAmendments reported printed
2015-03-04SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2015-03-04SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2015-03-04SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2015-02-25SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2015-02-16SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2015-02-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback