ID S1080 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Vetoed by the Governor on 04/11/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amends and adds to existing law relating to county officers to revise provisions relating to an action against county officials, county commissioners or auditors; to provide for duties of the Attorney General relating to preliminary investigations and actions against county elected officers; to provide a certain exception relating to the primary responsibility for enforcing penal laws; and to provide that the Attorney General shall have the duty to enforce a certain act with respect to certain violations committed by members of a Board of County Commissioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law relating to county officers to revise provisions relating to an action against county officials, county commissioners or auditors; to provide for duties of the Attorney General relating to preliminary investigations and actions against county elected officers; to provide a certain exception relating to the primary responsibility for enforcing penal laws; and to provide that the Attorney General shall have the duty to enforce a certain act with respect to certain violations committed by members of a Board of County Commissioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-04SenateVetoed by the Governor on 04/11/13
2013-04-04SenateReported delivered to Governor on 03/29/13
2013-03-29SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2013-03-29HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2013-03-28SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2013-03-28Senateto enrol
2013-03-28SenateTitle apvd
2013-03-28SenatePASSED -- 35-0-0
2013-03-28SenateRead third time as amended in the House
2013-03-26SenateRead second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading
2013-03-25SenateRead first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
2013-03-25SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2013-03-25SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
2013-03-25SenateReferred to 10th Order for possible concurrence
2013-03-25SenateReturned from House, amended
2013-03-25Houseto Senate
2013-03-25HouseTitle apvd
2013-03-25HousePASSED -- 62-3-5
2013-03-25HouseRead third time in full as amended in House
2013-03-22HouseRead second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading
2013-03-21HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2013-03-20HouseFiled for First Reading
2013-03-20HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2013-03-20HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2013-03-20HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2013-03-19HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders
2013-03-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-03-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2013-03-12HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2013-03-12HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2013-03-11Senateto House
2013-03-11SenateTitle apvd
2013-03-11SenatePASSED -- 34-0-1
2013-03-11SenateRead third time in full
2013-03-08SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2013-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback