ID S1080 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - 3rd rdg -- FAILED -- 15-52-3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends and adds to existing law relating to early childhood and early intervention services to revise provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law relating to early childhood and early intervention services to revise provisions.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-30 3rd rdg -- FAILED -- 15-52-3
2011-03-28 to 3rd rdg
2011-03-28 2nd rdg
2011-03-25 to 2nd rdg
2011-03-25 rec d/p
2011-03-25 Rpt out
2011-03-08 to Health/Wel
2011-03-08 1st rdg
2011-03-08 House intro
2011-03-07 to House
2011-03-07 Title apvd
2011-03-07 Corder
2011-03-07 27-8-0 AYES -- Andreason, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McGee, McKenzie, Mortimer, Schmidt, Smyser, Stegner, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Werk NAYS -- Bair, Fulcher, McKague, Nuxoll, Pearce, Siddoway, Vick, Winder Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor
2011-03-07 PASSED
2011-03-07 Rls susp
2011-03-07 to 3rd rdg as amen
2011-03-07 2nd rdg
2011-03-04 to 2nd rdg as amen
2011-03-04 1st rdg
2011-03-04 Rpt engros
2011-03-03 to engros
2011-03-03 Rpt out amen
2011-02-28 3rd rdg -- to 14th Ord
2011-02-21 to 3rd rdg
2011-02-21 2nd rdg
2011-02-18 to 2nd rdg
2011-02-18 rec d/p
2011-02-18 Rpt out
2011-02-11 to Health/Wel
2011-02-11 Rpt prt
2011-02-10 to printing
2011-02-10 1st rdg
2011-02-10 Senate intro

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback