ID S1078 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Session Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Session Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COUNTY RECORDERS -- Amends existing law to provide for the recording of death certificates and to clarify that certain documents must be recorded.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the recording of death certificates and to clarify that certain documents must be recorded.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-04-08 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-04-06 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-06 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4 |
2021-04-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2021-02-23 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |