ID S1076 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

LIQUOR STORES -- Amends and adds to existing law to authorize sample tastings of liquor in liquor stores, with certain requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to authorize sample tastings of liquor in liquor stores, with certain requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2019-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-27Senateto House
2019-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 22-12-1
2019-02-26SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-25SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback